skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/07/2019 8:17:56 PM

Pytka, Pauline Shirley

CPSO#: 33550

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone: (905) 523-4146 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. P. S. Pytka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAULINE SHIRLEY PYTKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PYTKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1982