skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/04/2019 4:28:47 PM

Taylor, Stephen Arthur

CPSO#: 33537

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stephen A. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 2 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Beamsville Medical Centre Family Health Team 4279 Huron Street Beamsville ON L0R 1B0
Date Received: 20 Dec 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2018