skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/09/2019 12:22:22 PM

Firstbrook, Peggy Jane

CPSO#: 33280

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Dec 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997