skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/07/2019 4:08:13 PM

Brown, Robert Ian Gordon

CPSO#: 33080

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1295 Riverbend Rd
London ON  N6K 0G2
Phone: (519) 858-2260
Fax: 519-473-2666 Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 04 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT IAN GORDON BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1982