skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/04/2019 10:17:05 PM

Britton, John Robert

CPSO#: 32910

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 226-3335
Fax: (613) 226-3337 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert J. Britton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Britton ( CPSO# 32910 )

Business Address:
206 - 1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 226-3335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT BRITTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRITTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1981