skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/04/2019 10:51:12 PM

McPherson, David Ernest

CPSO#: 32890

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Mc Pherson, David Ernest (used until: 28 Jul 1982 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2009