skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 5:46:25 AM

Roy, Marie Lessard

CPSO#: 32873

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Marie L. Roy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Roy ( CPSO# 32873 )

Business Address:
Don Mills-Eglinton Medical Centre
100 - 29 Gervais Drive
North York ON  M3C 1Z1
Phone Number: (416) 449-5511

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may write to Dr. Papdopoulos at One Medical Place, 302-20 Wynford Drive, Toronto, ON, M3C 1J4 Phone: 416-445-9673 Fax: 416-445-9388
Date Received: 10 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019