skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 5:59:10 PM

Burko, Thomas

CPSO#: 32809

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Nov 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
901-505 Consumers Road
North York ON  M2J4V8
Phone: (416) 631-0298 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. THOMAS BURKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Oct 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1984