skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/04/2019 6:22:19 AM

Francis, Thomas Patrick

CPSO#: 32732

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1998