skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/04/2019 6:28:11 AM

Rebot, Morris Ted Miroslaw

CPSO#: 32476

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jul 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
190 Sherway Drive
Suite 411
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 620-5070
Fax: (416) 620-1564 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. MTM Rebot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rebot ( CPSO# 32476 )

Business Address:
Suite 411
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 620-5070

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MORRIS TED MIROSLAW REBOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REBOT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1987