skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/04/2019 4:47:34 PM

Cole, Edward Herman

CPSO#: 32347

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 May 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 May 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
R Fraser Elliott Building
1st Floor, South Room 409
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4669
Fax: (416) 340-4016 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Edward Herman Cole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Cole ( CPSO# 32347 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
R. Fraser Elliot Building
1st Floor South Room 409
190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4669

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 15 Sep 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDWARD HERMAN COLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1981