skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/09/2019 12:32:17 PM

Buckley, Kenneth Charles

CPSO#: 31883

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Aug 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Aug 1997