skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/04/2019 8:01:47 PM

Darbyshire, Katherine Rhoda

CPSO#: 31868

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Aug 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winchester District Memorial Hospit
566 Louise St
Winchester,Ont, K0C 2K0
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-2422 Ext. 6770
Fax: (613) 774-5618 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K.R. Darbyshire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Darbyshire ( CPSO# 31868 )

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospit
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHERINE RHODA DARBYSHIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DARBYSHIRE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1984