skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 12:54:00 AM

Stanton, Eric Bruce

CPSO#: 31823

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jul 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
80 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2E2
Phone: 416 967 2600 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eric B. Stanton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Stanton ( CPSO# 31823 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIC BRUCE STANTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STANTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1980