skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 9:57:07 PM

Sharma, Anil Baldev

CPSO#: 31801

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jul 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2575 Innes Road
Gloucester ON  K1B 3K1
Phone: (613) 824-1666 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anil B. Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sharma ( CPSO# 31801 )

Business Address:
2575 Innes Road
Gloucester ON  K1B 3K1
Phone Number: (613) 824-1666

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANIL BALDEV SHARMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1980