skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 10:08:34 PM

Mulloy, John Vickers

CPSO#: 31731

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1122 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y4
Phone: (705) 222-2121 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Mulloy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mulloy ( CPSO# 31731 )

Business Address:
105 - 1122 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y4
Phone Number: (705) 222-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre,Sudbury Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN VICKERS MULLOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLOY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1980