skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:20:03 AM

Walker, Marilyn Louise

CPSO#: 31504

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 May 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
333 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1S 5N4
Phone: 613-560-7917 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Walker ( CPSO# 27420 )
Dr. M. Walker ( CPSO# 31504 )

Business Address:
10 - 737 Parkdale Avenue
Ground East
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone Number: (613) 761-4774

Business Address:
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C7
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Business Address:
Family Medicine Centre
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARILYN LOUISE WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1980