skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/04/2019 2:40:59 PM

Baeta, Basil Roderick

CPSO#: 31233

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Nov 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Medical records storage facility: Records Management Ltd. Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093, www.recordsregistry.ca, or Unit 13 - 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 17 Dec 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BASIL RODERICK BAETA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAETA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2012