skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:12:21 AM

Emond, Michael Gerard Joseph

CPSO#: 30829

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Dec 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael J Emond Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 1 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Kincardine Family Health Team, 44 Queen Street, Kincardine, Ontario N2Z 3C2 Tel: (519) 396-2700
Date Received: 17 Dec 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Dec 2018