skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 15/06/2019 10:44:19 PM

Colgan, Terence John

CPSO#: 30383

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Sep 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Life Labs
100 International Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6J6
Phone: (416) 675-4530 Ext. x42980
Fax: (416) 213-4206 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Colgan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Colgan ( CPSO# 30383 )

Business Address:
100 International Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6J6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TERENCE JOHN COLGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLGAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1978