skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 5:58:38 PM

Babay, Hichem

CPSO#: 30248

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jan 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French, Italian

Education:University of Tours, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hichem Babay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 9 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 19 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 May 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 04 May 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jan 2012

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 25, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Babay was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of sexual abuse and disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct. While these allegations were outstanding, Dr. Babay resigned from the College effective January 25, 2012, and agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.