skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/04/2019 2:41:22 PM

Juodis, Edward Aidas

CPSO#: 30200

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Lithuanian

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010