skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:17:07 AM

Akpata, Michael Oyewole

CPSO#: 30119

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Jan 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jan 2011

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 14, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective January 14, 2011, Dr. Akpata has resigned from the College and agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.