skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/04/2019 10:12:12 PM

Brunet, Donald George

CPSO#: 29849

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Donald Brunet Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 5 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 1. Paitent Records Kingston Health Sciences Centre 76 Stuart St Kingston, ON K7L 2V7 2. Martins Data Management 95 Terryfox Dr Kingston ON K7M 8N4 Tel: (613) 542-4510
Date Received: 27 Aug 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 27 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Aug 2018