skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/07/2019 4:37:55 PM

Hassaram, Shirley Tikamdas

CPSO#: 29610

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the Philippines, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 09 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 May 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007