skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 5:20:19 AM

Zavery, Oanali Taherali

CPSO#: 29588

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
65 Angeline Street North
Suite 7
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7
Phone: (705) 328-0461
Fax: (705) 328-0462 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: O. Zavery Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Zavery ( CPSO# 29588 )

Business Address:
7 - 65 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5N7
Phone Number: (705) 328-0461

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OANALI TAHERALI ZAVERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAVERY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1977