skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 10:38:32 PM

Evans, David

CPSO#: 29517

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking for records from the Chatham Walk in Clinic between 2005 and 2011 may contact: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Instructions: Patients must contact the College for any records before 2004 to arrange to contact Dr. Evans
Date Received: 13 Apr 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2013