skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 1:29:18 AM

Swart, Greta Toni

CPSO#: 29438

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Swart's medical records will remain with: C P R I 600 Sanatorium Road London, ON N6H 3W7 Tel: (519) 858-2774
Date Received: 30 Apr 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2013