skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 5:33:39 AM

Haber, Richard Michael

CPSO#: 29287

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2005