skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 12:20:43 PM

Brown, Mary Milroy

CPSO#: 29097

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Queensway Carlton Hospital, 3045 Baseline Road, Ottawa, ON, K2H 8P4
Date Received: 25 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016