skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 4:03:22 AM

Eddy, Allison Audrey

CPSO#: 29047

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Dec 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 1997