skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/09/2019 2:25:52 AM

Wall, William John

CPSO#: 28911

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: William Wall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: October 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. William John Wall to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 15, 2018:

Dr. Wall has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.