skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/04/2019 10:15:51 PM

Watt, Man-Joe

CPSO#: 28900

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Sep 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10230 - 111 Avenue
Edmonton AB  T5G 0B7
Phone: (780) 735-7918 Ext. 15444
Fax: (780) 735-7907

Additional Practice Location(s)

600 Townline Road South
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K6
Canada
Phone: (905) 728-1673
Fax: (905) 728-2961
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAN-JOE WATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Dec 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1989