skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 5:57:49 PM

Moran, Judith Carol

CPSO#: 28866

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Date Received: 29 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015