skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/04/2019 10:16:20 PM

Basmajian, Haig Lucas

CPSO#: 28775

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Sep 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H.L. Basmajian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Basmajian ( CPSO# 28775 )

Business Address:
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HAIG LUCAS BASMAJIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASMAJIAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1976