skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/04/2019 10:27:33 PM

Ward, Donna Marie

CPSO#: 28745

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Sep 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
298 Lawrence Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2M 1Y4
Phone: (519) 578-9757 Ext. 2
Fax: (519) 578-9750 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Donna M. Ward Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ward ( CPSO# 28745 )

Business Address:
298 Lawrence Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2M 1Y4
Phone Number: (519) 578-9757

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DONNA MARIE WARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1976