skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/07/2019 4:52:14 PM

Rubenstein, Warren Howard

CPSO#: 28322

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jun 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 25
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 5160
Fax: (416) 586-3175 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Warren Rubenstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 28322 )

Business Address:
Suite L4-200
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WARREN HOWARD RUBENSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RUBENSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1976