skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/04/2019 4:53:27 PM

Shugarman, Laurel Gilda Douglas

CPSO#: 28318

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jun 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAUREL GILDA DOUGLAS SHUGARMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUGARMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1976