skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/07/2019 10:24:38 AM

Wetmore, Stephen James

CPSO#: 28303

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Family Medical Centre
60 Chesley Avenue
London ON  N5Z 2C1
Phone: (519) 433 8424
Fax: (519) 433-5796 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wetmore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wetmore ( CPSO# 28303 )

Business Address:
Victoria Family Medical Centre
60 Chesley Avenue
London ON  N5Z 2C1
Phone Number: (519) 433-8424

Business Address:
800 Commissioner's Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHEN JAMES WETMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WETMORE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976