skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 5:54:57 PM

Nancekievill, Garry Winston

CPSO#: 28295

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 2015
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: R R 2, 11162 Ilderton Road, Ilderton, ON N0M 2A0
Date Received: 08 May 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2015

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: May 31, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Garry Nancekievill has resigned from the College.