skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 5:19:08 AM

Muller, Paul Julius

CPSO#: 28077

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jul 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Neurosurgical Clinic
3rd Floor, Donnelly Wing South
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 258-8959
Fax: (416) 924-2744 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Muller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Muller ( CPSO# 28077 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 258-8959

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL JULIUS MULLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Aug 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1982