skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/04/2019 10:44:55 PM

Barsoum, Nabila Joseph

CPSO#: 27959

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 14, 2012
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On June 18, 2012, York Central Hospital notified the College that Dr. Nabila J. Barsoum's privileges were restricted, effective May 14, 2012.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 31 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018