skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 4:14:19 AM

Bowdler, Ann Rogers

CPSO#: 27633

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can be advised that charts remain with the clinic that Dr. Bowdler saw the patient at.
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013


Instructions: Records will remain at the clinic where Dr. Bowdler saw the patient.
Date Received: 30 Jul 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2019