skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/04/2019 2:15:54 AM

Lem, Harry Allan

CPSO#: 27510

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006