skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/04/2019 2:49:37 AM

Loder, David Charles

CPSO#: 27453

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jun 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-5511 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Quinte Health Care
Trenton Memorial Site
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Canada
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Loder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Loder ( CPSO# 27453 )

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care
Trenton Memorial Site
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES LODER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LODER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1975