skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/04/2019 10:06:32 PM

Hall, Christopher Wayne

CPSO#: 27246

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 08 Apr 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 26 2012
Corporation Name: Chris W. Hall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Apr 2015