skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 12:34:06 AM

Eastwood, Katrina

CPSO#: 27147

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management, Unit 13, 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 16 May 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016