skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 22/04/2019 4:17:01 PM

Macquarrie, David Logan

CPSO#: 27071

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Mar 2010