skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 5:45:35 AM

Culham, James Ansley Gordon

CPSO#: 26941

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Oct 1994
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 1994