skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/07/2019 5:17:17 AM

Osuszek, Andrew Richard

CPSO#: 26539

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jun 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Whitby Medical Arts Imaging
Unit X17
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone: (905) 576-9729
Fax: (905) 438-9729 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oshawa Glazier Medical Imaging
Glazier Medical Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Canada
Phone: (905) 579-1445
Fax: (905) 579-6736
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

North Whitby Xray & Ultrasound
5959 Anderson Winchester Street
Brooklin ON  L1M 2E9
Canada
Phone: (905) 655-8313
Fax: (905) 655-0210
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew R. Osuszek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Osuszek ( CPSO# 26539 )

Business Address:
North Whitby Xray & Ultrasound
L6 - 5959 Anderson Avenue
Brooklin ON  L1M 2E9
Phone Number: (905) 665-8313

Business Address:
Oshawa Glazier Medical Imaging Centre
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (905) 579-1445

Business Address:
Humber River hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
D.1.
Toronto ON  M2M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
Whitby Medical Arts Centre
X17 - 1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (905) 579-9729

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW RICHARD OSUSZEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSUSZEK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1974